1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | LCO 1 of 3 |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6942 |
---|
6 | 6 | | January Session, 2025 |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT ESTABLISHING A RADON MITIGATION ASSISTANCE |
---|
11 | 11 | | PROGRAM FOR LOW -INCOME HOUSEHOLDS. |
---|
12 | 12 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
13 | 13 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
14 | 14 | | |
---|
15 | 15 | | Section 1. Section 8-446 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
16 | 16 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2025): 2 |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a) There is established an account to be known as the "Healthy 3 |
---|
18 | 18 | | Homes Fund" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the 4 |
---|
19 | 19 | | General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to 5 |
---|
20 | 20 | | be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account shall be expended 6 |
---|
21 | 21 | | by the Department of Housing for the purposes of: 7 |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) Funding of not more than one million dollars, from remittances 8 |
---|
23 | 23 | | transferred pursuant to section 38a-331 for the period beginning January 9 |
---|
24 | 24 | | 1, 2019, and ending December 31, 2019, shall be remitted to the 10 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Department of Economic and Community Development to be used for 11 |
---|
26 | 26 | | grants-in-aid to homeowners with homes located in the immediate 12 |
---|
27 | 27 | | vicinity of the West River in the Westville section of New Haven and 13 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Woodbridge for structurally damaged homes due to subsidence and to 14 |
---|
29 | 29 | | homeowners with homes abutting the Yale Golf Course in the Westville 15 |
---|
30 | 30 | | section of New Haven for damage to such homes from water infiltration 16 |
---|
31 | 31 | | or structural damage due to subsidence, and, from remittances 17 |
---|
32 | 32 | | transferred pursuant to section 38a-331, for the period beginning May 1, 18 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2022, and ending April 30, 2023, funding not exceeding the actual cost 19 Substitute Bill No. 6942 |
---|
34 | 34 | | |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | LCO 2 of 3 |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | of remediation or relocation shall be remitted to the Department of 20 |
---|
39 | 39 | | Housing to be used for grants-in-aid for the remediation of structurally 21 |
---|
40 | 40 | | deficient foundations in owner-occupied units or the relocation of any 22 |
---|
41 | 41 | | owner of any such unit of any condominium associations located in the 23 |
---|
42 | 42 | | town of Hamden; 24 |
---|
43 | 43 | | (2) Funding a program, and any related administrative expense, to 25 |
---|
44 | 44 | | reduce health and safety hazards in residential dwellings in 26 |
---|
45 | 45 | | [Connecticut] this state, including, but not limited to, lead, radon and 27 |
---|
46 | 46 | | other contaminants or conditions, through removal, remediation, 28 |
---|
47 | 47 | | abatement and other appropriate methods. For purposes of this 29 |
---|
48 | 48 | | subdivision, "administrative expense" means any administrative or 30 |
---|
49 | 49 | | other cost or expense incurred by the Department of Housing in 31 |
---|
50 | 50 | | carrying out the provisions of this section, including, but not limited to, 32 |
---|
51 | 51 | | the hiring of necessary employees and entering into necessary contracts; 33 |
---|
52 | 52 | | [and] 34 |
---|
53 | 53 | | (3) Funding of not more than one hundred seventy-five thousand 35 |
---|
54 | 54 | | dollars, from remittances transferred pursuant to section 38a-331 for the 36 |
---|
55 | 55 | | period beginning January 1, 2021, and ending December 31, 2021, shall 37 |
---|
56 | 56 | | be remitted to the captive insurance company established pursuant to 38 |
---|
57 | 57 | | section 38a-91vv, to be used for the research and development of the 39 |
---|
58 | 58 | | report described in section 4 of public act 21-120 and any related 40 |
---|
59 | 59 | | administrative expense. Such sum shall not be considered in calculating 41 |
---|
60 | 60 | | the total funds allocated or made available to the captive insurance 42 |
---|
61 | 61 | | company used for administrative or operational costs pursuant to 43 |
---|
62 | 62 | | section 38a-91vv; and 44 |
---|
63 | 63 | | (4) Funding a program, and any related administrative expense, to 45 |
---|
64 | 64 | | reduce health and safety hazards in residential dwellings in this state 46 |
---|
65 | 65 | | relating to radon, through removal, remediation, abatement and other 47 |
---|
66 | 66 | | appropriate methods. Any program created pursuant to this 48 |
---|
67 | 67 | | subdivision shall be available to low-income households. For purposes 49 |
---|
68 | 68 | | of this subdivision, "administrative expense" means any administrative 50 |
---|
69 | 69 | | or other cost or expense incurred by the Department of Housing in 51 |
---|
70 | 70 | | carrying out the provisions of this section, including, but not limited to, 52 Substitute Bill No. 6942 |
---|
71 | 71 | | |
---|
72 | 72 | | |
---|
73 | 73 | | LCO 3 of 3 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | the hiring of necessary employees and entering into necessary contracts 53 |
---|
76 | 76 | | and "low-income household" means a person or family with an annual 54 |
---|
77 | 77 | | income at or below eighty per cent of the median income. 55 |
---|
78 | 78 | | (b) The Department of Housing shall notify the Department of Public 56 |
---|
79 | 79 | | Health not later than thirty days after the deposit of remittances in the 57 |
---|
80 | 80 | | Healthy Homes Fund pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (c) of 58 |
---|
81 | 81 | | section 38a-331. Not later than thirty days after the deposit of 59 |
---|
82 | 82 | | remittances pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (c) of section 38a-60 |
---|
83 | 83 | | 331, the Department of Public Health shall notify each municipal health 61 |
---|
84 | 84 | | department in the state annually regarding funds available pursuant to 62 |
---|
85 | 85 | | the Healthy Homes Fund established pursuant to subsection (a) of this 63 |
---|
86 | 86 | | section. 64 |
---|
87 | 87 | | (c) Not later than January 1, 2020, and annually thereafter, the 65 |
---|
88 | 88 | | Commissioner of Housing shall report to the joint standing committees 66 |
---|
89 | 89 | | of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to 67 |
---|
90 | 90 | | housing, planning and development and appropriations and the 68 |
---|
91 | 91 | | budgets of state agencies, in accordance with section 11-4a, regarding 69 |
---|
92 | 92 | | the status of the Healthy Homes Fund established pursuant to this 70 |
---|
93 | 93 | | section and all moneys deposited into and expended by the Department 71 |
---|
94 | 94 | | of Housing pursuant to said account. Any such report may be submitted 72 |
---|
95 | 95 | | electronically. 73 |
---|
96 | 96 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
97 | 97 | | sections: |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | Section 1 July 1, 2025 8-446 |
---|
100 | 100 | | |
---|