House | 04/29/2025 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | File Number 233 | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | House Calendar Number 161 | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/25 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |