House | 04/24/2025 | File Number 765 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | House Calendar Number 478 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/25 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |