House | 04/28/2025 | File Number 784 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | House Calendar Number 489 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/25 12:00 PM | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |