House | 04/23/2025 | File Number 757 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | House Calendar Number 472 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/25 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |