House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/25 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |