Senate | 04/28/2025 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | File Number 666 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 355 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/25 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Vote to Draft |