Senate | 03/18/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |