Connecticut 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01186 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO 3731 1 of 2
3+LCO No. 3731 1 of 2
44
55 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1186
66 January Session, 2025
77 LCO No. 3731
88
99
10-Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND
11-DEVELOPMENT
10+Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
1211
1312
1413 Introduced by:
1514 (PD)
16-
1715
1816
1917 AN ACT CONCERNING THE REGIONAL PLANNING INCENTIVE
2018 ACCOUNT DISTRIBUTION FORMULA.
2119 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2220 Assembly convened:
2321
2422 Section 1. Subsection (d) of section 4-66k of the general statutes is 1
2523 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2
2624 2025): 3
2725 (d) (1) For the fiscal years ending June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2023, 4
2826 funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be distributed 5
2927 to each regional council of governments [formed] created pursuant to 6
3028 section 4-124j, in the amount of one hundred eighty-five thousand five 7
3129 hundred dollars plus sixty-eight cents per capita, using population 8
3230 information from the most recent federal decennial census. 9
3331 (2) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, and each fiscal year 10
3432 thereafter, funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be 11
3533 distributed to [the] each regional council of governments [formed] 12
3634 created pursuant to section 4-124j, in [the] an amount totaling seven 13
37-million dollars. Such funds shall be distributed under a formula 14 Raised Bill No. 1186
38-
39-
40-LCO 3731 2 of 2
41-
35+million dollars. Such funds shall be distributed under a formula 14
4236 determined by the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management in 15
4337 consultation with the regional [council] councils of governments, that 16
4438 includes (A) a base payment amount payable to each such regional 17
39+Raised Bill No. 1186
40+
41+
42+
43+LCO No. 3731 2 of 2
44+
4545 council, and (B) a per capita payment amount to each such regional 18
4646 council based upon population data for each such regional council from 19
4747 the most recent federal decennial census, adjusted in accordance with 20
4848 any change in the consumer price index for all urban consumers as 21
4949 published by the United States Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor 22
5050 Statistics, during the preceding twelve-month period, if such change 23
5151 reflects an increase in said index. Such formula shall be reviewed and 24
5252 updated [every five years after the initial adoption of such formula] 25
5353 annually. 26
5454 (3) Not later than July 1, 2021, and annually thereafter, each regional 27
5555 council of governments shall submit to the secretary a proposal for 28
5656 expenditure of the funds described in [subdivision (1) of] this 29
5757 subsection. Such proposal may include, but need not be limited to, a 30
5858 description of (A) functions, activities or services currently performed 31
5959 by the state or municipalities that may be provided in a more efficient, 32
6060 cost-effective, responsive or higher quality manner by such regional 33
6161 council, a regional educational service center or similar regional entity; 34
6262 (B) anticipated cost savings relating to the sharing of government 35
6363 services, including, but not limited to, joint purchasing; (C) the 36
6464 standardization and alignment of various regions of the state; or (D) any 37
6565 other initiatives that may facilitate the delivery of services to the public 38
6666 in a more efficient, cost-effective, responsive or higher quality manner. 39
6767 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
6868 sections:
6969
7070 Section 1 July 1, 2025 4-66k(d)
7171
72-PD Joint Favorable
73-
72+Statement of Purpose:
73+To index the per capita payment amount to each regional council of
74+governments from the regional planning incentive account to any
75+increase in the consumer price index for all urban consumers.
76+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
77+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
78+underlined.]