LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB01206
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01206
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2025 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01206
Action History
Senate
02/14/2025
Public Hearing 02/20
Senate
02/11/2025
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
Senate
02/04/2025
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Senate
02/04/2025
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Senate
02/03/2025
Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
Senate
01/30/2025
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law