Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | File Number 30 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 65 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/03/25 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Public Hearing 02/06 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |