House | 04/16/2025 | House Calendar Number 457 | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | File Number 281 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 182 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |