Senate | 04/29/2025 | File Number 796 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 415 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Public Hearing 03/26 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |