Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01414 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/26/2025

                         
 
LCO No. 5509  	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1414  
January Session, 2025 
LCO No. 5509 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND 
EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HED)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PERCENTAGE OF COURSES TAUGHT 
BY PART-TIME FACULTY AT THE CONNECTICUT STATE 
COMMUNITY COLLEGE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2025) (a) As used in this section: 1 
(1) "Part-time faculty" means a person appointed on a semester-by-2 
semester basis to teach a specific course or specific courses; and 3 
(2) "Academic courses" does not include a course of study in which 4 
the purpose is to teach practical or technical skills for a specific licensed 5 
or certified occupation. 6 
(b) The Board of Regents for Higher Education shall include in any 7 
agreement collectively bargained on and after July 1, 2025, with the 8 
employee organizations representing faculty employed at the 9 
Connecticut State Community College a provision concerning the 10 
percentage of academic courses that may be taught at said college by 11 
part-time faculty. Such provision shall permit part-time faculty to teach 12     
Raised Bill No.  1414 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5509   	2 of 2 
 
(1) not more than forty-five per cent of the total number of academic 13 
courses on and after July 1, 2026, (2) not more than thirty-five per cent 14 
of the total number of academic courses on and after July 1, 2027, and 15 
(3) not more than twenty-five per cent of the total number of academic 16 
courses on and after July 1, 2028. 17 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2025 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require a phased-in reduction of the percentage of courses taught by 
part-time faculty at the Connecticut State Community College. 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]