Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | File Number 613 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 338 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |