Senate | 04/24/2025 | File Number 761 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 405 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |