Council | 06/23/2023 | Law L25-0009, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008833 | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 04/28/2023 | Act A25-0067 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006095 | ||
Council | 04/25/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0067 | ||
Council | 04/10/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/14/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 02/13/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0004 | ||
Council | 02/10/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 01/13/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0004 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/03/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |