9 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | _______________ |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | ______________________ |
---|
16 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip |
---|
17 | | - | Credit Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the 2023 increase to the |
---|
18 | | - | tipped minimum wage will take effect from January 1, 2023, to Ma y 1, 2023. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
21 | | - | act may be cited as the "Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification |
---|
22 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023". |
---|
23 | | - | Sec. 2. New p aragraph (3) added to section 4(f) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act |
---|
24 | | - | of 1992, effective March 25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9 -248; D.C. Official Code § 32- 1003(f)), by |
---|
25 | | - | section 2(a) of Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip Credit Elimination Act |
---|
26 | | - | of 2022, enacted on November 30, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 700; D.C. Official Code § 32- 1003), is |
---|
27 | | - | amended by striking the date “January 1, 2023” and inserting the date “Ma y 1, 2023” in its place. |
---|
28 | | - | |
---|
29 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
30 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
31 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). |
---|
32 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
33 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
34 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
35 | | - | |
---|
36 | | - | |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | |
---|
| 5 | + | _________________________________ 1 |
---|
| 6 | + | Councilmember Anita Bonds 2 |
---|
| 7 | + | 3 |
---|
| 8 | + | 4 |
---|
| 9 | + | 5 |
---|
| 10 | + | 6 |
---|
| 11 | + | A BILL 7 |
---|
| 12 | + | _______________ 8 |
---|
| 13 | + | 9 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 |
---|
| 15 | + | ______________________ 11 |
---|
| 16 | + | 12 |
---|
| 17 | + | To amend, on an emergency basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip 13 |
---|
| 18 | + | Credit Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the 2023 increase to the 14 |
---|
| 19 | + | tipped minimum wage will take effect from January 1, 2023, to May 1, 2023. 15 |
---|
| 20 | + | 16 |
---|
| 21 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, T hat this 17 |
---|
| 22 | + | act may be cited as the "Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification 18 |
---|
| 23 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023". 19 |
---|
| 24 | + | Sec. 2. Section 2(a) of Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip Credit 20 |
---|
| 25 | + | Elimination Act of 2022, enacted on November 30, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-700; D.C. Official Code § 21 |
---|
| 26 | + | 32-1003), amending section 4(f)(3) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992, effective 22 |
---|
| 27 | + | March 25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9-248; D.C. Official Code § 32-1003), is amended by striking the 23 |
---|
| 28 | + | phrase “January 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “May 1, 2023” in its place. 24 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 25 |
---|
| 30 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 26 |
---|
| 31 | + | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 27 |
---|
| 32 | + | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 28 |
---|
| 33 | + | Sec. 4. Effective date. 29 |
---|
42 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
43 | | - | D.C. Official Code §1- 204.12(a)). |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chairman |
---|
48 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Mayor |
---|
55 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
56 | | - | |
---|
| 37 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 30 |
---|
| 38 | + | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 31 |
---|
| 39 | + | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 32 |
---|
| 40 | + | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 33 |
---|
| 41 | + | D.C. Official Code §1-204.12(a)). 34 |
---|