Council | 06/16/2023 | Law L25-0003, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008442 | ||
Council | 04/13/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 03/31/2023 | Act A25-0064 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003840 | ||
Council | 03/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0064 | ||
Council | 03/13/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0020 | ||
Council | 01/20/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0020 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 01/11/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |