Council | 11/16/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0026 | ||
Council | 11/14/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/08/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/12/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/10/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/08/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/20/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0026 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor | ||
Council | 01/11/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |