Council | 02/16/2024 | Law L25-0115, Effective from Jan 26, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001663 | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Act A25-0322 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015622 | ||
Council | 12/07/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 12/03/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0322 | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/28/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/26/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0042 | ||
Council | 09/25/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 06/08/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/12/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/05/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Council | 01/27/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0042 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/19/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |