Council | 02/16/2024 | Law L25-0104, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001652 | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 12/01/2023 | Act A25-0306 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015450 | ||
Council | 11/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0306 | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Amendment | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Chairman Mendelson - ANS | ||
Council | 11/06/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Postponed to 11/7/23 | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0055 | ||
Council | 07/12/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/23/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/16/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 01/27/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0055 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/20/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |