Council | 10/06/2023 | Law L25-0058, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013069 | ||
Council | 08/04/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 08/04/2023 | Act A25-0185 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010709 | ||
Council | 08/01/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/31/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0185 | ||
Council | 07/21/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/06/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0070 | ||
Council | 03/14/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/24/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/16/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 02/03/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0070 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/25/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |