Council
|
02/23/2024
|
Law L25-0121, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001846
|
|
|
Council
|
01/03/2024
|
Transmitted to Congress
|
|
|
Council
|
12/29/2023
|
Act A25-0329 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016568
|
|
|
Council
|
12/22/2023
|
Returned from Mayor
|
|
|
Council
|
12/21/2023
|
Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0329
|
|
|
Council
|
12/08/2023
|
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 21, 2023
|
|
|
Council
|
12/05/2023
|
Final Reading, CC
|
|
|
Council
|
11/07/2023
|
First Reading, CC
|
|
|
Council
|
10/31/2023
|
Committee Report Filed
|
|
|
Council
|
10/18/2023
|
Committee Mark-up of B25-0071
|
|
|
Council
|
10/16/2023
|
Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
|
|
|
Council
|
05/15/2023
|
Public Hearing Held
|
|
|
Council
|
05/05/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
05/01/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Cancelled
|
|
|
Council
|
04/24/2023
|
Cancellation Notice of Public Hearing Filed
|
|
|
Council
|
04/07/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
04/04/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
|
|
|
Council
|
02/03/2023
|
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0071 Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
01/26/2023
|
Introduced in Office of the Secretary
|
|
|