District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0087 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Immunization of School 
Students Act of 1979 to postpone the date by which students must be vaccinated against 
COVID- 19.   
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 
be cited as the “Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional Review 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 3a(a) of the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979, effective 
March 2, 2022 (D.C. Law 24-	85; D.C. Official Code § 38-	502.01(a)), is amended by striking the 
phrase “School Year 2022-	2023” both times it appears and inserting the phrase “School Year 
2023-2024” in its place.   
 
Sec. 3.  Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of November 22, 2022. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4aof the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or, in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia