Council | 06/16/2023 | Law L25-0005, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008444, Expires on Jan 05, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/13/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 03/31/2023 | Act A25-0062 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003836 | ||
Council | 03/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0062 | ||
Council | 03/13/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/10/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0090 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/06/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |