Council | 02/21/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/17/2023 | Act A25-0011 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002093, Expires on May 14, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/14/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/13/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0011, Expires on May 14, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/13/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 28, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 02/06/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |