District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0098 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 ____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
  	To amend, on a temporary basis, the Small and Certified Business Enterprise Development and 
Assistance Act of 2005 to require that for a business enterprise to be certified as a local 	business enterprise it must be independently owned, operated	, and controlled, more than 
50% owned, operated, and controlled by a District-based enterprise or not -for-profit 
business, or owned by a non-	District- based business enterprise or not-for-profit business 
that is more than 50% owned by District residents, and to require currently certified local 
business enterprises that do not meet one of these 	requirements to be recertified. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Local Business Enterprise Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 
2023”. 
 	Sec. 2. T he Small and Certified Business Enterprise Development and Assistance Act of 
2005, effective October 20, 2005 (D.C. Law 16-	33; D.C. Official Code § 2-218.01 et seq .), is 
amended as follows: 
(a) Section 2331 (D.C. Official Code § 2-	218.31) is amended by adding a new paragraph 
(1A) to read as follows: 
 “(1A)(A) Is: 
 “(i) Independently owned, operated, and controlled; 
 “(ii) More than 50% owned	, operated, and controlled by a District-
based enterprise or not-for-profit business; or  
 “(iii) Owned by a non- District- based business enterprise or not	-for-
profit business that is more than 50% owned by District residents. 
 “(B) For the purposes of this paragraph, the term “	Independently owned, 
operated, and controlled” includes a business enterprise that manages and controls its day-	to-day 
operations without being subject to control, restriction, modification, or limitation by another 	business enterprise or not-for-profit business that has an ownership or other 	financial interest in 
the business enterprise.”. 
(b) A new section 2331a is added to read as follows: 
“Sec. 2331a.  Grace period for compliance with section 2331(1A).    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 “(a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, a business enterprise currently 
certified as a local business enterprise pursuant this act that does not meet the requirements of 
section 2331( 1A) and has not submitted a new application to the Department of Small and 
Local Business Development to be re	certified as a local business enterprise within 9	0 days of 
the effective date of the Local Business Enterprise Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 
2021, effective July 21, 2021 (D.C. Act 24-	118; 68 DCR 7323), shall have its certification 
revoked pursuant to section 2363(a)(2)(B	).   
 “(b) A business enterprise currently certified as a local business enterprise 	pursuant to 
this act that does not meet the requirements of section 2331(1A) but has an existing contract with 
the District, or was included as a subcontractor on a subcontracting plan on an existing contract 
with the District, shall be permitted to complete the term of that contract or subcontract, 
including the base year and any option years under the contract or subcontract, and receive the 
appropriate credit towards assisting an agency in meeting its goals pursuant to section 2341 and 
subcontracting points pursuant to section 2346 under its current certification	.  Upon completion 
of the term of that contract , the business enterprise must meet the requirements of section 
2331(1A) and be recertified to remain a local business enterprise	.”. 
 
 Sec. 3. Technical amendment. 
 Section 3 of the Local Solar Expansion Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on January 10, 
2023 (D.C. Act 24-	742; 70 DCR 606), is amended by striking the phrase “subsection (a) of this 
section;” and inserting the phrase “section 4;” in its place. 
 
 Sec. 4. Applicability. 
 Section 2 shall apply as of February 10, 2023. 
 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   
 
 Sec. 6. Effective date. 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30	-day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December  
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 
Columbia register.  
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia