Council | 03/10/2023 | Act A25-0040 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002991, Expires on May 28, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/28/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/27/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0040, Expires on May 28, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/15/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 01/31/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |