Council | 06/23/2023 | Law L25-0020, Effective from Jun 14, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008843, Expires on Jan 25, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/05/2023 | Act A25-0091 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006341 | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 04/26/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/26/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0091 | ||
Council | 04/11/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 26, 2023 | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/21/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/10/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0166 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 03/06/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |