Council
|
09/29/2023
|
Law L25-0047, Effective from Aug 29, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012880
|
|
|
Council
|
07/18/2023
|
Transmitted to Congress
|
|
|
Council
|
07/14/2023
|
Act A25-0161 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009700
|
|
|
Council
|
07/11/2023
|
Returned from Mayor
|
|
|
Council
|
07/10/2023
|
Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0161
|
|
|
Council
|
06/27/2023
|
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 12, 2023
|
|
|
Council
|
06/01/2023
|
Committee Report Filed
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Final Reading
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (Pinto)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (McDuffie and TWhite)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (L.George)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (Nadeau)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (Nadeau and Pinto)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (TWhite #6) - Not considered at the request of CM TWhite
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (TWhite #5)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (TWhite #4) - Not considered at the request of CM TWhite
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (TWhite #3)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (TWhite #2) - Not considered at the request of CM TWhite
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (TWhite #1) - Not considered at the request of CM TWhite
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (Mendelson #2)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment (Mendelson #1)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/30/2023
|
Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
|
|
|
Council
|
05/16/2023
|
First Reading, CC
|
|
|
Council
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee Mark-up of B25-0203
|
|
|
Council
|
04/14/2023
|
Public Hearing Held
|
|
|
Council
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Council
|
03/31/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
03/31/2023
|
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0203 Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
03/22/2023
|
Introduced in Office of the Secretary
|
|
|