Council | 09/29/2023 | Law L25-0048, Effective from Aug 29, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012881, Expires on Apr 10, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/21/2023 | Act A25-0171 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009918 | ||
Council | 07/18/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 07/18/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0171 | ||
Council | 07/03/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 18, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 05/30/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 05/30/2023 | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/22/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |