District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0207 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/04/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
 
_________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Act of 
2016 to extend the completion date for rehabilitation of houses in Historic Anacostia. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Extension 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 2 of the Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Act of 2016, 
effective March 11, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-223; 64 DCR 182), is amended as follows: 
 (a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “2000 P Street, N.W., Suite 320, 
Washington, D.C. 20036” and inserting the phrase “1307 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 
400, Washington, D.C. 20036” in its place.  
(b) Subsection (b) is amended by striking the phrase “5 years” and inserting the phrase 
“10 years” in its place.   
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability.  
 This act shall apply as of March 15, 2023. 
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia