District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0297 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/06/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
__________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To approve, on an emergency basis, Modification Nos. 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW94770 
with ASI Government, LLC to provide acquisition support personnel and technical 
writing subject matter experts, and to authorize payment for the goods and services 
received and to be received under the modifications. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRI CT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW94770 with ASI 
Government, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2.  Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the 
requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 
2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Modifications 3, 
4, and 5 to Contract No. CW94770 with ASI Government, LLC to provide acquisition support 
personnel and technical writing subject matter experts and authorizes payment in the not-to-
exceed amount of $10 million for the goods and services received and to be received from 
December 28, 2022 through December 27, 2023. 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.   
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia