Council | 06/30/2023 | Act A25-0128 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009034, Expires on Sep 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0128, Expires on Sep 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/12/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 27, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/01/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |