Council | 10/06/2023 | Law L25-0055, Effective from Sep 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013066, Expires on Apr 28, 2024 | ||
Council | 08/04/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 08/04/2023 | Act A25-0182 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010702 | ||
Council | 08/01/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/26/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0182 | ||
Council | 07/18/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0336 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/15/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |