Council | 02/06/2024 | Recommitted to Committee | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 11/28/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/27/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/19/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0350 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |