Council | 12/15/2023 | Law L25-0085, Effective from Dec 01, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015723, Expires on Jul 13, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/20/2023 | Act A25-0255 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013845 | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 10/17/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/16/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0255 | ||
Council | 10/04/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 19, 2023 | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0355 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/29/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |