Council | 06/28/2024 | Law L25-0179, Effective from Jun 12, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007357 | ||
Council | 05/03/2024 | Act A25-0461 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005032 | ||
Council | 04/30/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 04/29/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/25/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0461 | ||
Council | 04/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 30, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 04/01/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0356 | ||
Council | 01/18/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0356 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 06/29/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |