District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0389 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
1+1
52
63 1
4+ 2
5+________________________________ __________________________________ 3
6+Councilmember Anita Bonds Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 4
7+ 5
8+ 6
9+ 7
10+ 8
11+ 9
12+A BILL 10
13+ ___________ 11
14+ 12
15+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13
16+_______________ 14
17+ 15
18+ 16
19+To amend, on an emergency basis, the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016 to 17
20+prohibit private disability insurance providers from reducing short-term disability 18
21+benefits based on actual or estimated paid leave benefits an eligible individual may 19
22+be entitled to from the District, regardless of the jurisdiction in which the insurance 20
23+policy was issued or written; and to amend Title I of the Insurance Trade and 21
24+Economic Development Amendment Act of 2000 to make offsetting or reducing 22
25+benefits under a private market short-term disability insurance policy, based on 23
26+estimated or actual benefits received under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment 24
27+Act of 2016, enforceable under that law, regardless of the jurisdiction in which the 25
28+insurance policy was issued or written. 26
29+ 27
30+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 28
31+act may be cited as the “Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Clarification 29
32+Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 30
33+ Sec. 2. Section 107(j)(1) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective 31
34+April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.07(j)(1)), is amended to read as 32
35+follows: 33
36+“(1) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible 34
37+individual under an individual or group policy for temporary or short-term disability insurance 35
38+based on estimated or actual benefits the eligible individual may or does receive under this act, 36
39+regardless of the jurisdiction in which such policy was issued, executed, written, or delivered.”. 37 2
740
8-AN ACT
41+Sec. 3. Section 120a the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act of 38
42+2000, effective April 2, 2001 (D.C. Law 13-265; D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.20a), is amended 39
43+as follows: 40
44+(a) Subsection (a) is amended to read as follows: 41
45+“(a) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible individual 42
46+under a temporary or short-term disability insurance policy, based on estimated or actual benefits 43
47+the eligible individual may or does receive under the subchapter IV of Chapter 5 of Title 32 44
48+regardless of in which jurisdiction such policy was executed, written, or delivered.”. 45
49+(b) Subsection (c) is amended to read as follows: 46
50+“(c) For the purposes of this section, the term: 47
51+ “(1) “Eligible individual” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 48
52+101(6) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 49
53+21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(6)). 50
54+ “(2) “Self-insured employer” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 51
55+101(19A) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. 52
56+Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(19A)).”. 53
57+Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 54
58+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 55
59+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 56
60+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 57
61+Sec. 5. Effective date. 58
62+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 59
63+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 60 3
964
10- ___________
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-_______________
15-
16-
17-To amend, on an emergency basis, the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016 to
18-prohibit private disability insurance providers from reducing short-term disability
19-benefits based on actual or estimated paid leave benefits to which an eligible
20-individual may be entitled from the District, regardless of the jurisdiction in which
21-the insurance policy was issued or written; and to amend Title I of the Insurance
22-Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act of 2000 to make the
23-prohibition on offsetting or reducing benefits under a private market short-term
24-disability insurance policy based on estimated or actual benefits received under the
25-Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016 enforceable under that law
26-regardless of the jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was issued or written.
27-
28-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
29-act may be cited as the “Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Clarification
30-Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”.
31-
32- Sec. 2. Section 107(j)(1) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective
33-April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.07(j)(1)), is amended to read as
34-follows:
35-“(1) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible
36-individual under an individual or group policy for temporary or short-term disability insurance
37-based on estimated or actual benefits the eligible individual may or does receive under this act,
38-regardless of the jurisdiction in which such policy was issued, executed, written, or delivered.”.
39-
40-Sec. 3. Section 120a the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act of
41-2000, effective November 13, 2021 (D.C. Law 24-45; D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.20a), is
42-amended as follows:
43-(a) Subsection (a) is amended to read as follows:
44-“(a) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible individual
45-under a temporary or short-term disability insurance policy, based on estimated or actual benefits
46-the eligible individual may or does receive under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
51-2
52-
53-2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01 et seq.),
54-regardless of in which jurisdiction such policy was executed, written, or delivered.”.
55-(b) Subsection (c) is amended to read as follows:
56-“(c) For the purposes of this section, the term:
57- “(1) “Eligible individual” shall have the same meaning as provided in section
58-101(6) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law
59-21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(6)).
60- “(2) “Self-insured employer” shall have the same meaning as provided in section
61-101(19A) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C.
62-Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(19A)).”.
63-
64-Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
65-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
66-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
67-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
68-
69-Sec. 5. Effective date.
70-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
71-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
72-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
73-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
74-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
75-
76-
77-______________________________
78-Chairman
79-Council of the District of Columbia
80-
81-
82-
83-
84-
85-_________________________________
86-Mayor
87-District of Columbia
88-
65+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 61
66+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 62
67+D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 63