Council | 08/04/2023 | Act A25-0211 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010778, Expires on Oct 29, 2023 | ||
Council | 08/01/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/31/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0211, Expires on Oct 29, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/20/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 3, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 07/03/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |