District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0409 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/11/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
__________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To approve, on an emergency basis, Contract No. CW106027 with Voyager Trucking 
Corporation to provide municipal solid waste hauling and disposal services to the 
Department of Public Works, and to authorize payment for the goods and services 
received and to be received under that contract and modifications.  
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW106027 with Voyager Trucking Corporation Approval 
and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2.  Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the 
requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 
2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 
CW106027 with Voyager Trucking Corporation to provide municipal solid waste hauling and 
disposal services to the Department of Public Works and authorizes payment in the not-to-
exceed amount of $15,709,910 for the goods and services received and to be received from 
March 1, 2023 through February 28, 2025.  
 
 Sec. 3.   Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 4.   Effective date.  
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia