Council | 01/12/2024 | Act A25-0344 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000648, Expires on Apr 04, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/05/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 01/05/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0344, Expires on Apr 04, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/20/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Agendized; not considered at the request of Nadeau | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 07/05/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |