Council | 04/05/2024 | Law L25-0144, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003860 | ||
Council | 02/09/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 02/09/2024 | Act A25-0391 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001477 | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0391 | ||
Council | 01/22/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 5, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/14/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 12/12/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0419 | ||
Council | 11/29/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 10/04/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 08/25/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 08/23/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0419 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 07/10/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |