Council | 03/21/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/15/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/13/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/27/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0460 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |