LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
B25-0464
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0464
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0464
Action History
Council
11/02/2023
Public Hearing Held
Council
10/13/2023
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Council
10/05/2023
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Council
09/22/2023
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0464 Published in the DC Register
Council
09/19/2023
Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services
Council
09/18/2023
Introduced in Office of the Secretary