Council | 01/24/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 01/05/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/02/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0471 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |