Council | 03/15/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0475 | ||
Council | 02/28/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 01/11/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/18/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0475 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |