1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | 1 |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | ______________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | _________________________ |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | |
---|
18 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Immunization of School |
---|
19 | | - | Students Act of 1979 to remove the requirement that eligible students in the District of |
---|
20 | | - | Columbia receive a vaccination against COVID-19; and to repeal the Coronavirus |
---|
21 | | - | Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act of 2022. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | act may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
25 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023”. |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. The Immunization of School Students Act of 1979, effective September 28, 1979 |
---|
28 | | - | (D.C. Law 3-20: D.C. Official Code § 38-501 et seq.), is amended as follows: |
---|
29 | | - | (a) Section 2(2A) (D.C. Official Code § 38-501(2A)) is repealed. |
---|
30 | | - | (b) Section 3a (D.C. Official Code § 38-502.01) is repealed. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) Section 4 (D.C. Official Code § 38-503) is amended by striking the phrase “; |
---|
32 | | - | provided, that the Mayor may not issue regulations that conflict with the requirements of section |
---|
33 | | - | 3a.” and inserting a period in its place. |
---|
34 | | - | |
---|
35 | | - | Sec. 3. The Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act |
---|
36 | | - | of 2022, effective February 23, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-274; 70 DCR 15080), is repealed. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 4. Applicability. |
---|
39 | | - | This act shall apply as of July 31, 2023. |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
42 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
43 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
44 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | Sec. 6. Effective date. ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the Mayor, |
---|
54 | | - | action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 90 days, |
---|
55 | | - | as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 412(a) of |
---|
56 | | - | the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; D.C. |
---|
57 | | - | Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). |
---|
58 | | - | |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Chairman |
---|
61 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
63 | | - | |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Mayor |
---|
69 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
72 | | - | |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
74 | | - | |
---|
75 | | - | |
---|
76 | | - | |
---|
77 | | - | |
---|
78 | | - | |
---|
| 1 | + | ___________________________ ___________________________ 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | Chairman Phil Mendelson Councilmember Christina Henderson 2 |
---|
| 3 | + | 3 |
---|
| 4 | + | 4 |
---|
| 5 | + | 5 |
---|
| 6 | + | A BILL 6 |
---|
| 7 | + | 7 |
---|
| 8 | + | ________ 8 |
---|
| 9 | + | 9 |
---|
| 10 | + | 10 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 12 | + | 12 |
---|
| 13 | + | ________________ 13 |
---|
| 14 | + | 14 |
---|
| 15 | + | To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Immunization of School 15 |
---|
| 16 | + | Students Act of 1979 to remove the requirement that eligible students in the District of 16 |
---|
| 17 | + | Columbia receive a vaccination against COVID-19; and to repeal the Coronavirus 17 |
---|
| 18 | + | Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act of 2022. 18 |
---|
| 19 | + | 19 |
---|
| 20 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 |
---|
| 21 | + | act may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Congressional Review Emergency 21 |
---|
| 22 | + | Amendment Act of 2023”. 22 |
---|
| 23 | + | Sec. 2. The Immunization of School Students Act of 1979, effective September 28, 1979 23 |
---|
| 24 | + | (D.C. Law 3-20: D.C. Official Code § 38-501 et seq.), is amended as follows: 24 |
---|
| 25 | + | (a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 38-501) is amended by repealing paragraph (2A). 25 |
---|
| 26 | + | (b) Section 3a (D.C. Official Code § 38-502.01) is repealed. 26 |
---|
| 27 | + | (c) Section 4 (D.C. Official Code § 38-503) is amended by striking the phrase “; 27 |
---|
| 28 | + | provided, that the Mayor may not issue regulations that conflict with the requirements of section 28 |
---|
| 29 | + | 3a.” and inserting a period in its place. 29 |
---|
| 30 | + | Sec. 3. The Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act 30 |
---|
| 31 | + | of 2022, effective February 23, 2023, (D.C. Law 24-0274), is repealed. 31 |
---|
| 32 | + | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 32 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 33 |
---|
| 33 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 34 |
---|
| 34 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 35 |
---|
| 35 | + | Sec. 5. Effective date. 36 |
---|
| 36 | + | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 37 |
---|
| 37 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 38 |
---|
| 38 | + | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 39 |
---|
| 39 | + | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 40 |
---|
| 40 | + | Columbia Register. 41 |
---|
| 41 | + | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 42 |
---|