1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | 1 |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | __________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
| 1 | + | GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
| 2 | + | Office |
---|
| 3 | + | of the Attorney General |
---|
| 4 | + | *** |
---|
| 5 | + | ATTORNEY GENERAL |
---|
| 6 | + | BRIAN L. SCHWALB |
---|
| 7 | + | September 26, 2023 |
---|
| 8 | + | The Honorable Phil Mendelson, Chairman |
---|
| 9 | + | Council |
---|
| 10 | + | of the District of Columbia |
---|
| 11 | + | John |
---|
| 12 | + | A. Wilson Building |
---|
| 13 | + | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 |
---|
| 14 | + | Washington, |
---|
| 15 | + | DC 20004 |
---|
| 16 | + | Dear Chairman Mendelson: |
---|
| 17 | + | Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council |
---|
| 18 | + | of the District of Columbia is proposed |
---|
| 19 | + | emergency legislation, the "Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll |
---|
| 20 | + | PLLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act |
---|
| 21 | + | of 2024" and accompanying |
---|
| 22 | + | emergency declaration resolution |
---|
| 23 | + | to approve the award of the proposed definitive multiyear |
---|
| 24 | + | Contract Number DCCB-2023-F-0039 to Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC (Cohen Milstein). |
---|
| 25 | + | This contract arranges outside legal counsel from Cohen Milstein |
---|
| 26 | + | to assist the Office of the |
---|
| 27 | + | Attorney General with the investigation |
---|
| 28 | + | of and potential litigation against identified targets in the |
---|
| 29 | + | housing industry for violations |
---|
| 30 | + | of antitrust laws. The contract is a definitive multi-year, |
---|
| 31 | + | contingency-fee contract with a not-to-exceed contract amount |
---|
| 32 | + | of $90 million. The base period |
---|
| 33 | + | of performance is from the date of award through five years thereafter. This contract will |
---|
| 34 | + | definitize a letter contract awarded on May 26, 2023. |
---|
| 35 | + | If you have any questions, please contact Deputy Attorney General Candyce Phoenix at (202) |
---|
| 36 | + | 788-2066 or Candyce.Phoenix@dc.gov. I look forward |
---|
| 37 | + | to favorable consideration of this |
---|
| 38 | + | contract. |
---|
| 39 | + | Sincerely, |
---|
| 40 | + | Brian |
---|
| 41 | + | L. Schwalb |
---|
| 42 | + | Attorney General |
---|
| 43 | + | Enclosures |
---|
| 44 | + | 400 Sixth Street NW, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20001-5790, (202) 727-3400, Fax (202) 730-0484 1 |
---|
| 45 | + | 2 |
---|
| 46 | + | 3 |
---|
| 47 | + | 4 |
---|
| 48 | + | 5 |
---|
| 49 | + | 6 |
---|
| 50 | + | 7 |
---|
| 51 | + | 8 |
---|
| 52 | + | 9 |
---|
| 53 | + | 10 |
---|
| 54 | + | 11 |
---|
| 55 | + | 12 |
---|
| 56 | + | 13 |
---|
| 57 | + | 14 |
---|
| 58 | + | 15 |
---|
| 59 | + | ~ |
---|
| 60 | + | at the request of the Attorney General |
---|
| 61 | + | A BILL |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | __________________ |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen |
---|
18 | | - | Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney |
---|
19 | | - | General, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received |
---|
20 | | - | under the contract. |
---|
21 | | - | |
---|
22 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
23 | | - | act may be cited as the “Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll |
---|
24 | | - | PLLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved |
---|
27 | | - | December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the |
---|
28 | | - | Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. |
---|
29 | | - | Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 |
---|
30 | | - | with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney |
---|
31 | | - | General for an antitrust matter and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount of $90 |
---|
32 | | - | million for goods and services received and to be received under Contract No. DCCB-2023-F- |
---|
33 | | - | 0039. |
---|
34 | | - | |
---|
35 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
36 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal |
---|
37 | | - | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, |
---|
38 | | - | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
39 | | - | |
---|
40 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
41 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
42 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
43 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
54 | | - | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). |
---|
55 | | - | |
---|
56 | | - | |
---|
57 | | - | |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Chairman |
---|
60 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
61 | | - | |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
63 | | - | |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Mayor |
---|
68 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
| 63 | + | 16 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen |
---|
| 64 | + | 17 Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, |
---|
| 65 | + | to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney |
---|
| 66 | + | 18 General, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received |
---|
| 67 | + | 19 under the contract. |
---|
| 68 | + | 20 |
---|
| 69 | + | 21 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
| 70 | + | 22 act may be cited as the "Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll |
---|
| 71 | + | 23 PLLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023". |
---|
| 72 | + | 24 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved |
---|
| 73 | + | 25 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51 ), and section 202 of the |
---|
| 74 | + | 26 Procurement Practices Reform Act |
---|
| 75 | + | of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. |
---|
| 76 | + | 27 Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves multiyear Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0039 |
---|
| 77 | + | 28 with Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, to provide legal services to the Office of the Attorney |
---|
| 78 | + | 29 General for an anti-trust matter, and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount |
---|
| 79 | + | of $90 |
---|
| 80 | + | 30 million for goods and services received and to |
---|
| 81 | + | be received under Contract No. DCCB-2023-F- |
---|
| 82 | + | 31 0039. |
---|
| 83 | + | 32 Sec. 3. The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement provided by the Chief Financial |
---|
| 84 | + | 33 Officer as the fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative 34 Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code§ 1- |
---|
| 85 | + | 35 301.47a). |
---|
| 86 | + | 36 Sec. 4. This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of |
---|
| 87 | + | 37 veto by the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no |
---|
| 88 | + | 38 longer than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in |
---|
| 89 | + | 39 Section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 |
---|
| 90 | + | 40 Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code§ l-204.12(a)). |
---|